IL SB1588 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Sexual Harassment No Contact Order Act. Adds provisions relating to: purpose; definitions; persons protected; commencement of action and filing fees; pleading and nondisclosure of address; application of rules of civil procedure and victim advocates; appointment of counsel; trial by jury; subject matter jurisdiction; jurisdiction over persons; venue; process; service of notice of hearings; hearings; continuances; sexual harassment no contact orders and remedies; mutual orders prohibited; accountability for actions of others; emergency sexual harassment no contact order; plenary sexual harassment no contact order; duration and extension of orders; contents of orders; notice of orders; short form notification; modification and reopening of orders; violation; arrest without warrant; and data maintenance by law enforcement. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012 to create the offense of violation of a sexual harassment no contact order. Makes conforming changes in the Protective Orders Article of the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Effective immediately.
Title
SEXUAL HARASSMENT NO CONTACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 042-006-002 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bush |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 006-002-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 006-002-000 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 13-10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
725 | 5 | 112A-1.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 112A-11.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 112A-14.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
725 | 5 | 112A-2.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 112A-21.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
725 | 5 | 112A-23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 112A-28 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 112A-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 112A-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 112A-4.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 112A-5.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |