IL SB1577 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0452
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois False Claims Act. Provides that a person who commits certain acts is liable to the State for a civil penalty of not less than the minimum amount and not more than the maximum amount allowed for a civil penalty for a violation of the federal False Claims Act (31 U.S.C. 3729 et seq.) as adjusted by the Federal Civil Penalties Inflation Adjustment Act of 1990 (28 U.S.C. 2461) (instead of a penalty of not less than $5,500 and not more than $11,000). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FALSE CLAIMS ACT-PENALTIES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-25SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0452
2017-08-25SenateEffective Date August 25, 2017
2017-08-25SenateGovernor Approved
2017-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-18HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-17HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-17HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-05-16HouseArrived in House
2017-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-05-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Morrison
2017-05-16SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 006-000-000
2017-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2017-05-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-05-12SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-04-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2017-03-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-03-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-03-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-03-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass Human Services; 009-000-000
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Human Services
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Human Services
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7401753Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback