IL SB1570 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Chicago Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. In a provision that requires Employers to submit payroll records and pension contributions within 30 calendar days after each predesignated payday and establishes penalties for delinquent submissions, requires the Fund to provide a written notice of delinquency to an Employer within 10 business days of the Fund's discovery of any payroll record that is not timely certified or submitted or any incomplete pension contribution. Prohibits the Fund from administering certain penalties if the Fund fails to provide the written notice of delinquency. Provides that an Employer that provides necessary corrections to a payroll record or makes the required contribution within 12 months after receipt of the notice of delinquency shall not be subject to certain penalties. Makes changes to an exception to the mandatory penalty for delinquent payments. Provides that any penalties that are outstanding on the effective date of the amendatory Act shall be waived if the Employer makes the necessary corrections or amendments to the required payroll records or submits the required contribution. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-CTPF-PAYROLL RECORDS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 012-000-000
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled in Licensed Activities and Pensions; Martinez
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40517-132Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback