IL SB1552 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0320
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0320
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. In a provision concerning court files, provides that relevant information, reports and records, held by the Department of Juvenile Justice, including social investigation, psychological and medical records, of any juvenile offender, shall be made available to any county juvenile detention facility upon written request by the Superintendent or Director of that juvenile detention facility, to the Chief Records Officer of the Department of Juvenile Justice where the subject youth is or was in the custody of the Department of Juvenile Justice and is subsequently ordered to be held in a county juvenile detention facility. Provides legislative findings. Effective immediately.
Title
JUVENILE COURT-INFORMATION
Sponsors
Sen. Cristina Castro [D] | Rep. Dave Vella [D] | Rep. Daniel Swanson [R] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] |
Rep. Tony McCombie [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-06 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0320 |
2021-08-06 | Senate | Effective Date August 6, 2021 |
2021-08-06 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2021-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Criminal Law |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Cristina Castro |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2021-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 116-000-000 |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2021-05-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-05-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-05-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2021-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 405 | 5-901 | Amended Code | Citation Text |