IL SB1540 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Requires a deputy registrar to return completed voter registration materials to the proper election authority within 2 business days after receipt until the last day for accepting registrations before an election (now, within 7 days until the 35th day before an election and within 48 hours between the 35th and 28th days before an election). Prohibits the State Board of Elections and the Secretary of State from adopting rules that require otherwise for Secretary of State employees serving as deputy registrars at driver's license facilities. Prohibits the unauthorized copying or dissemination of personal or other information from a voter registration application. Makes violation a Class A misdemeanor.
Title
ELECTIONS-VOTER REGISTRATION
Sponsors
Sen. Chapin Rose [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Subcommittee on Election Law |
2013-02-28 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Election Law |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 4-6.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 5-16.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 6-50.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1540&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB1540.htm |