IL SB1526 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0403
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0403
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that, except in personal injury actions, every count in every complaint and counterclaim must request specific remedies the party believes it should receive from the court. Provides that in a personal injury action, a party may not claim an amount of money unless necessary to comply with the circuit court rules about where a case is assigned. Provides that any complaint filed that contains an amount claimed shall be dismissed without prejudice. Provides that a party may request remedies from the court in the alternative. Provides that, except in the case of default, the remedies requested from the court do not limit the remedies available. Provides that in case of default, if a remedy is sought in the pleading that is beyond what the defaulted party requested, notice shall be given to the default party. Provides that the defendant is not prohibited from requesting from the plaintiff the amount of damages sought. Repeals a provision regarding prayer for relief.
Title
CIV PRO-PRAYER FOR RELIEF
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] |
Rep. Margo McDermed [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0403 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2019-05-01 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | House | To Civil Procedure Subcommittee |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-03-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 045-000-000 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 2-604 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 2-604.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |