IL SB1506 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 1 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on December 1 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that, for State Board of Education appointments made after the effective date of the amendatory Act, 3 of the members of the State Board must represent the educator community. Sets forth the qualifications for these members and makes other changes with regard to the qualifications of members of the State Board.
Title
SCH CD-ST BD ED-EDUCATOR MEM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-01 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-01 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-01 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2016-12-01 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 054-000-000 |
2016-12-01 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-000-000 |
2016-12-01 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2016-11-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Education; 011-000-000 |
2016-11-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Education; 011-000-000 |
2016-11-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Education |
2016-11-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Education |
2016-11-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2016-11-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2016-11-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2016-11-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2016-11-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 3 - November 29, 2016 |
2016-11-16 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 3 |
2016-11-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 |
2016-11-16 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2016-11-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-11-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2016-11-16 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-11-15 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-11-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 023-000-000 |
2016-11-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2016-11-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-11-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-11-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-11-14 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2016-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-01-29 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 28, 2016 |
2015-12-04 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 29, 2016 |
2015-10-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 4, 2015 |
2015-09-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 31, 2015 |
2015-08-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) September 30, 2015 |
2015-07-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 31, 2015 |
2015-06-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 31, 2015 |
2015-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2015 |
2015-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2015-05-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-26 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000 |
2015-05-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2015-05-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2015-05-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2015-05-22 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-18 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2015-05-18 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2015-05-18 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2015-05-18 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 22, 2015 |
2015-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2015-04-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-16 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-16 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. John Bradley |
2015-04-16 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 047-001-000 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 26, 2015 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 1A-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 1A-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 1A-2.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |