IL SB1479 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0442
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0442
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that grace period registration and changes of address shall be conducted for eligible residents in connection with voting at certain elder care facilities. Effective immediately.
Title
ELEC-GRACE PERIOD/NURSING HOME
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Link [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] | Sen. Omar Aquino [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
Rep. Silvana Tabares [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0442 |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Effective Date August 25, 2017 |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 016-000-000 |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | House | Assigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-05 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-05-05 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2017 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 017-000-000 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Reported Back To Executive; 003-000-000 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Election Law |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 4-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 5-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 6-100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |