IL SB1475 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0280
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0280
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends Metropolitan Water Reclamation District Act. Provides that persons employed by the sanitary district must be a United States citizen, a national of the United States, an alien lawfully admitted for permanent residence, or an individual who has been granted asylum. Effective immediately.
Title
METRO WATER RECLAM-EMPLOYEES
Sponsors
Sen. Antonio Munoz [D] | Rep. Edward Acevedo [D] | Rep. Andre Thapedi [D] | Rep. Dennis Reboletti [R] |
Rep. Derrick Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0280 |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date August 9, 2013 |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2013-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2013-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André M. Thapedi |
2013-05-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-004-000 |
2013-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2013-04-30 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2013-04-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-30 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-30 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo |
2013-04-17 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2013 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2013 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 010-000-000 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 2605 | 11.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |