IL SB1474 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-4)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0003
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Collective Bargaining Freedom Act. Provides that employers and labor organizations covered by the National Labor Relations Act may execute and apply agreements requiring membership in a labor organization as a condition of employment to the fullest extent authorized by the National Labor Relations Act. Provides that it is the policy of the State that employers, employees, and their labor organizations are free to bargain collectively. Provides that the authority to enact laws or rules that restrict the use of union security agreements between an employer and a labor organization vests exclusively with the General Assembly. Prohibits local governments from enforcing any such law or rule. Defines terms. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COLLECTIVE BARGAINING FREEDOM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0003
2019-04-12SenateEffective Date April 12, 2019
2019-04-12SenateGovernor Approved
2019-04-11SenateSent to the Governor
2019-04-10SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-04-10SenateSenate Concurs
2019-04-10SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 051-000-000
2019-04-10SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Labor; 010-003-000
2019-04-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-04-09SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Labor
2019-04-09SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-04-09SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - April 4, 2019
2019-04-03SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2019-04-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-04-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-04-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-04-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-04-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-008-000
2019-04-03HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-29HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2019-03-28HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-28HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-03-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2019-03-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-20HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 021-004-000
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-03-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lance Yednock
2019-03-13HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-03-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-07HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-07HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
2019-03-07HouseArrived in House
2019-03-07SenateThird Reading - Passed; 042-012-000
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 7, 2019
2019-03-06SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2019-03-06SenateDo Pass as Amended Labor; 010-005-000
2019-03-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-03-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
2019-03-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-02-20SenateAssigned to Labor
2019-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1474&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1474.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1474eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1474enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1474sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1474ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB1474_03072019_019000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100SB1474_04032019_002000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB1474ham001_04102019_107000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback