IL SB1466 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wildlife Code. Provides that any person may use a crossbow to take coyotes during any coyote season. Effective immediately.
Title
CROSSBOW HUNTING-COYOTES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2017-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-001-000 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Agriculture; 009-001-000 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Agriculture |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
520 | 5 | 2.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |