IL SB1465 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-03 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that prior approval by the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to administer to a recipient of medical assistance any interferon-free therapy for the treatment of the hepatitis C virus shall be limited to certain criteria, including that: (i) the recipient must be 18 years of age; (ii) the recipient must have a diagnosis of chronic hepatitis C infection, genotype 1, 2, 3, or 4, confirmed by stage 2 fibrosis; (iii) the recipient must not have end stage renal disease requiring dialysis; and (iv) the recipient may not have abused a controlled substance within the past 6 months. Provides that the Department may not use certain criteria as a basis for requiring prior approval to administer to a recipient of medical assistance any interferon-free therapy for the treatment of the hepatitis C virus, including: (a) any evidence or known diagnosis of malignancy of any body organ; (b) the recipient's mental capacity or any determination related to the recipient's ability to make appropriate decisions about the interferon-free therapy treatment or to comply with related instructions; and (c) the fact that the recipient was previously administered an interferon-free therapy for the treatment of the hepatitis C virus. Contains provisions concerning persons authorized to prescribe an interferon-free therapy for the treatment of the hepatitis C virus to a recipient of medical assistance; the submission of lab results; an appeals process; and payments to managed care entities for any interferon-free therapy for the treatment of the hepatitis C virus that is prescribed to a recipient of medical assistance. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEDICAID-HEPATITIS C-TREATMENT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 32 N: 20 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-01-03HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2016-11-30HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2016-11-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2016-11-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2016-11-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2016-11-22HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2016-11-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2016-11-18HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2015-05-22HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2015-05-08HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 15, 2015
2015-05-04HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2015-04-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2015-04-24HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robyn Gabel
2015-04-23HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2015-04-23HouseFirst Reading
2015-04-23HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2015-04-23HouseArrived in House
2015-04-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 032-020-000
2015-04-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2015-04-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2015-04-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Trotter
2015-04-22SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2015-04-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 008-000-000
2015-04-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2015-04-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2015
2015-04-21SenateSecond Reading
2015-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2015-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2015-03-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 26, 2015
2015-03-25SenateDo Pass Human Services; 006-003-000
2015-03-18SenatePostponed - Human Services
2015-03-11SenatePostponed - Human Services
2015-03-04SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2015-03-04SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2015-03-03SenateAssigned to Human Services
2015-02-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2015-02-20SenateFirst Reading
2015-02-20SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-5.12bNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback