IL SB1451 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
Hearing: May 29 @ 9:00 am in Room 413 Stratton Building
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Small Wireless Facilities Deployment Act. Provides for legislative intent for the Act and definitions. Provides that an authority (a unit of local government with control over rights-of-way) may not prohibit, regulate, or charge for the collocation of small wireless facilities (the installation, mounting, maintaining, modifying, operating, or replacement of small wireless facilities on or adjacent to a wireless support structure or utility pole). Provides that small wireless facilities shall be classified as permitted uses and not subject to zoning review and approval under specified circumstances. Provides requirements for applications, fees, application review, and issuance of permits for collocation of small wireless facilities. Provides that an authority may not require applications for routine maintenance or replacement of wireless facilities with wireless facilities that are substantially similar, of the same size, or smaller. Requires authorities to allow the collocation of small wireless facilities on authority utility poles under specified circumstances. Prohibits authorities from regulating the design, engineering, construction, installation, or operation of any small wireless facility in specified circumstances. Provides that a circuit court has jurisdiction to resolve all disputes arising under the Act. Prohibits an authority from requiring a wireless provider to indemnify the authority or its officers or employees and from naming the authority on a wireless provider's insurance policy. Limits home rule powers. Amends the Counties Code making conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SMALL WIRELESS FACILITIES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-25HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-05-25HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Public Utilities Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-25HouseAssigned to Public Utilities Committee
2017-05-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-24HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-05-24HouseArrived in House
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 047-008-000
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Link
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Link
2017-05-24SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Telecommunications and Information Technology; 011-004-000
2017-05-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Telecommunications and Information Technology
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
2017-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments
2017-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments
2017-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
2017-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Telecommunications and Information Technology; 010-001-000
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Telecommunications and Information Technology
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5555-12001.2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback