IL SB1431 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1159
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1159
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Makes technical changes concerning the vacancies in a forest preserve district office and notifications of vacancies in county and forest preserve district offices. Provides that notification shall be given of each established political party within 3 days of the county board meeting where the vacancy was declared, rather than within 3 days of the occurrence of the vacancy. Amends the Public Officer Prohibited Activities Act. Authorizes a county board member in any county (now, in a county having fewer than 40,000 inhabitants), during his or her term of office, to concurrently hold the office of member of the board of education, regional board of school trustees, board of school directors, board of a community college district, or board of school inspectors. Effective immediately.
Title
COUNTY BOARD MEMBERS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-04 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1159 |
2015-01-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-12-12 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-12-04 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-12-04 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 050-000-000 |
2014-12-04 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2014-12-03 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000 |
2014-12-03 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2014-12-02 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2014-12-02 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - December 3, 2014 |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2014-12-02 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-004-000 |
2014-12-02 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2014-12-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-12-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2014-12-02 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2014-12-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-000-000 |
2014-12-01 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2014-12-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-12-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-12-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2014-12-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-12-01 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2013-05-24 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2013-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2013-04-24 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2013-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2013-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2013 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Reported Back To Executive; 002-000-000 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Election Law |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 25-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 105 | 1.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |