IL SB1431 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Riverboat Gambling Act. Requires the Illinois Gaming Board to award owners licenses to applicants whose plans (i) generate the highest amount of revenue to the State and (ii) provide for the least amount of cannibalization of existing licensees' revenues generated pursuant to this Act. Conditions the approval of relocation to a new home dock location for a licensee that was not conducting riverboat gambling on January 1, 1998 upon the determination that the new home dock provides for the least amount of cannibalization of an existing licensee's revenues. Effective immediately.
Title
RIVERBOATS-CANNIBALIZATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-12 | To Gaming Subcommittee on Gaming Activities | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to Gaming | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-18 | First Reading | |
2009-02-18 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Noland |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1431&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB1431.htm |