IL SB1429 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0218
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0218
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the title of "An Act concerning criminal law", Public Act 94-397, by providing that the Act may be referred to as the Michelle Eppel Law. Effective immediately.
Title
MICHELLE EPPEL LAW
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-10 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0218 | |
2009-08-10 | Effective Date August 10, 2009 | |
2009-08-10 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-13 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Flider | |
2009-05-13 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-13 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-06 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-30 | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2009-04-14 | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-26 | First Reading | |
2009-03-26 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-03-26 | Arrived in House | |
2009-03-26 | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-05 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 6, 2009 | |
2009-03-05 | Do Pass Criminal Law; 007-000-000 | |
2009-02-27 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to Criminal Law | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-18 | First Reading | |
2009-02-18 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Rutherford |