IL SB1399 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-5)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0276
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-5)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0276
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Replaces the provisions of the Section concerning actions for damages for personal injury based on childhood sexual abuse with language providing that an action for damages based on childhood sexual abuse may be commenced at any time. Provides that the changes made by the amendatory Act apply to actions pending on the effective date of the Act and to actions commenced on or after that date.
Title
CIV PRO-CHILDHOOD SEXUAL ABUSE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0276 |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Pam Roth |
2013-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Martwick |
2013-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2013-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2013-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2013-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2013-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2013-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2013-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2013-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2013-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2013-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2013-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2013-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2013-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary; 016-000-000 |
2013-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2013-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-05-03 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Ann Williams |
2013-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Mell |
2013-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2013-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2013-04-29 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-04-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-29 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 048-004-000 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Link |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 011-000-000 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Judiciary |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2013 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2013 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 011-001-000 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 13-202.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |