IL SB1362 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unemployment Insurance Act. Provides that an individual shall be ineligible for benefits for any week in a benefit year which begins on or after January 1, 2018, unless, subsequent to the beginning of his or her immediately preceding benefit year with respect to which benefits were paid to him or her, he or she was reemployed and had earnings equal to or in excess of his or her current weekly benefit amount in each of 4 calendar weeks that are either for services in employment, or have been or will be reported pursuant to the provisions of the Federal Insurance Contributions Act by each employing unit for which such services are performed and that submits a statement certifying to that fact.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UNEMPLOY INS-REQUALIFY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-17SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-01SenateTo Subcommittee on Special Issues (LA)
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Labor
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
820405607Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback