IL SB1339 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the Department of Corrections shall, by January 1, 2012, establish uniform procedures by which interested parties, including victims, law enforcement, prosecutors, and the Prisoner Review Board, may be notified of, and comment upon, the projected early release of an inmate because of an award of good conduct credit for meritorious service. Provides that these rules and regulations must provide that comments be submitted in writing or electronically. Provides that upon promulgation of these rules and regulations, the Department of Corrections may consider and shall include in the inmate's record any comments submitted by interested parties. Effective immediately.
Title
CD CORR-EARLY RELEASE NOTICE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-18 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2011-03-09 | Senate | To Criminal Law Subcommittee on Special Issues; - 3-17-11 - Held |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2011-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-14-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1339&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB1339.htm |