IL SB1308 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Human Rights Act. Provides that, in addition to any other relief that may be awarded or penalties that may be imposed under the Act, in a proceeding brought under the Employment Article, if there is a finding that an employer committed a civil rights violation against a female employee based upon the employee's sex, the award of damages may be increased up to an amount not to exceed 3 times any actual damages sustained. Amends the Equal Pay Act of 2003. Provides that, in addition to any other relief that may be awarded or penalties that may be imposed under the Act, if there is a finding that an employer committed a violation of this Act against a female employee, the award of damages may be increased up to an amount not to exceed 3 times any underpayment.
Title
HUMAN RTS, EQUAL PAY-DAMAGES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-04-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-03-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Annazette R. Collins |
2011-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 8, 2011 |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 5 | 8A-104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 112 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1308&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB1308.htm |