IL SB1298 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-5)
Status: Passed on July 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-31 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0222
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-5)
Status: Passed on July 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-31 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0222
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Caregiver Advise, Record, and Enable Act. Provides that after a patient is admitted as an inpatient into a hospital and before the patient is discharged or transferred, the hospital shall provide the patient or the patient's legal representative with an opportunity to designate a caregiver. Provides that the hospital shall document the patient's designation of a caregiver. Requires the hospital to notify the patient's designated caregiver prior to the patient's discharge or transfer, unless the patient indicates that he or she does not want the designated caregiver to be notified. Requires the hospital to consult with the designated caregiver and issue a discharge plan that contains certain information. Provides that the hospital issuing the discharge plan shall make an effort to provide or arrange for the designated caregiver to receive instructions in the after-care assistance tasks described in the discharge plan. Provides that the Act shall not be construed to interfere with the rights of an agent operating under a valid health care directive and shall not be construed to create a private right of action against certain individuals and entities. Contains other provisions. Effective 180 days after becoming law.
Title
HOSPITAL DISCHARGE-CAREGIVERS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-31 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0222 |
2015-07-31 | Senate | Effective Date January 27, 2016 |
2015-07-31 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2015-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2015-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2015-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2015-05-13 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2015-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2015-05-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2015-04-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2015-04-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2015-04-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2015-04-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2015-04-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 013-000-000 |
2015-04-20 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-14 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2015-03-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2015-03-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2015 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 19, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Judiciary |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |