IL SB1278 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-16 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-16 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
CRIMINAL LAW-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason Plummer |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jason Plummer |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 570 | 101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |