IL SB1248 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wildlife Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning deer hunting.
Title
WILDLIFE-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Agriculture |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 23, 2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
520 | 5 | 2.24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |