IL SB1200 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0606
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0606
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Rare Disease Commission Act. Changes the repeal date of the Act from January 1, 2020 to January 1, 2023. Amends the Lyme Disease Prevention and Protection Act. Provides that the Lyme Disease Task Force shall consist of 8 additional members appointed by the Speaker of the House of Representatives, Minority Leader of the House of Representatives, President of the Senate, and Minority Leader of the Senate. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Requires the Move Over Task Force to submit its report to the General Assembly no later than January 1, 2021 (currently, January 1, 2020). Repeals the Task Force on January 1, 2022 (currently, January 1, 2021). Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that the Task Force on Children of Incarcerated Parents shall submit a report of its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly and the Governor by March 1, 2020 (currently, December 31, 2019). Removes the repeal of provisions concerning Task Force membership, meetings, and duties. Repeals the Task Force on Children of Incarcerated Parents on July 1, 2020. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
TASK FORCES-REPORTS-REPEALS
Sponsors
Sen. Dan McConchie [R] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Rep. Daniel Swanson [R] |
Rep. Sonya Harper [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-11-14 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0606 |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Effective Date December 13, 2019 |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-11-14 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-000-000 |
2019-11-14 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2019-11-13 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dan McConchie |
2019-11-13 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-11-13 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Dan McConchie |
2019-11-13 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000 |
2019-11-12 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government |
2019-11-12 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-11-12 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-11-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - November 12, 2019 |
2019-11-04 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-10-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2019-10-30 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2019-10-29 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-10-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2019-10-28 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-10-28 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-10-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-10-28 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-10-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-10-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2019-10-28 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-10-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-10-21 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 27, 2019 |
2019-10-21 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-29 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-03-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 046-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 018-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2705 | 2705-210 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2705 | 49.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |