IL SB1128 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Banking Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
REGULATION-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), the following amendments will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
205 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |