IL SB1046 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-18 - Sponsor Removed Sen. Sue Rezin
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-18 - Sponsor Removed Sen. Sue Rezin
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-18 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Sue Rezin |
2015-10-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-10-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-10-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-10-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As October 20, 2015 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Executive |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Executive |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Darin M. LaHood |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Matt Murphy |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Duffy |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 375 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |