IL SB1007 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0402
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0402
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Recorder Division of the Counties Code. Provides that certificates of discharge and other specified documents relating to military service that have been recorded by a county clerk or recorder of deeds shall be made available for public inspection and copying in accordance with the archival schedule adopted by the National Archives and Records Administration and subject to redaction of information that is considered private under the Illinois Freedom of Information Act, the Federal Freedom of Information Act, and the Federal Privacy Act. Effective date.
Title
COUNTIES-DOCUMENTS-MILITARY
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Weaver [R] | Sen. David Koehler [D] | Rep. Timothy Butler [R] | Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] |
Rep. Daniel Swanson [R] | Rep. Michael Unes [R] | Rep. Keith Sommer [R] | Rep. Ryan Spain [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0402 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Effective Date August 16, 2019 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2019-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-05-02 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Tim Butler |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2019-04-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Weaver |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 006-000-000 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 215 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |