IL SB0968 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0306
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0306
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that a group or individual policy of accident and health insurance or a managed care plan that is amended, delivered, issued, or renewed on or after January 1, 2022 shall provide coverage for medically necessary pancreatic cancer screening. Makes conforming changes in the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971, the Counties Code, the Illinois Municipal Code, the School Code, the Health Maintenance Organization Act, the Limited Health Service Organization Act, the Voluntary Health Services Plans Act, and the Illinois Public Aid Code.
Title
HEALTH-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-06 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0306 |
2021-08-06 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-06 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 112-000-000 |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Insurance Committee; 019-000-000 |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2021-05-03 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2021-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Johnson |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 014-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
405 | 22 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |