IL SB0937 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Prompt Payment Act. Provides that utility services provided to the State by a unit of local government are subject to the provisions of the Act. Effective immediately.
Title
PROMPT PAYMNT-PUBLIC UTILITIES
Sponsors
Sen. Pat McGuire [D] | Sen. Tom Rooney [R] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Rep. Mike Fortner [R] |
Rep. Joe Sosnowski [R] | Rep. Robert Rita [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-05-15 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-04 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2017-05-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 007-000-000 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Rooney |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 540 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |