IL SB0930 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0304
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0304
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that the task force on disability income insurance and parity for behavioral health conditions shall submit findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 31, 2022 (rather than December 31, 2020). Provides that the task force is dissolved and the provision is repealed on January 1, 2023 (rather than December 31, 2021). Effective immediately.
Title
TASK FORCE-DISABILITY INC INS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-06 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0304 |
2021-08-06 | Senate | Effective Date August 6, 2021 |
2021-08-06 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 116-000-000 |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-20 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Insurance Committee; 018-000-000 |
2021-05-18 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Bob Morgan |
2021-05-13 | House | Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2021-05-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-11 | House | First Reading |
2021-05-07 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-05-07 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Morrison |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 011-000-000 |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2021 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 80 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |