IL SB0852 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Nuclear Facility Safety Act. Makes a technical change in a Section on legislative findings.
Title
SMOKE FREE-SIGNS-ASHTRAYS
Sponsors
Sen. John Mulroe [D] | Sen. Donne Trotter [D] | Rep. Michael McAuliffe [R] | Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] |
Rep. Dennis Reboletti [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 43 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 78 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 78 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-22 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1023 |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Effective Date August 22, 2014 |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 043-010-002 |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2014-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2014-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2014 |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2014-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2014-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2014-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 078-035-000 |
2014-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2014-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2014-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2014-05-28 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-28 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2014-05-28 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2014-05-28 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2014-05-28 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2014-05-23 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 30, 2014 |
2014-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2014-05-19 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2014-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 30, 2014 |
2014-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2014-05-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-15 | House | First Reading |
2014-05-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2014-05-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Mulroe |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 015-000-000 |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 16, 2014 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 8, 2014 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2014 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2013 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2013 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2013 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 010-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
420 | 10 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |