IL SB0849 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Cigarette Fire Safety Standard Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
SAFETY-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; 3-9(b) |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2013 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2013 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 010-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
425 | 8 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |