IL SB0808 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0301
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0301
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Educator Licensure Article of School Code. With regard to licensure candidates being required to pass a teacher performance assessment, provides that a candidate may not be required to submit test materials by video submission. Effective immediately.
Title
STUDENT TEACHER CANDIDATE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 89 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 89 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-06 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0301 |
2021-08-06 | Senate | Effective Date August 6, 2021 |
2021-08-06 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Education; 013-000-000 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Education |
2021-05-25 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-25 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 24, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2021-05-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 089-025-000 |
2021-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-13 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000 |
2021-05-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; by Voice Vote |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2021-05-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2021-05-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2021-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 047-005-000 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Murphy |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Darren Bailey |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 015-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 118 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |