IL SB0755 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0208
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0208
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Provides that the Department of Children and Family Services must maintain the name, electronic mail address, and telephone number for each minor's court-appointed guardian ad litem and, if applicable, the guardian ad litem's supervisor. Provides that the Department must update this contact information within 5 days of receiving notice of a change. Provides that the Advocacy Office for Children and Families must make this contact information available to the minor, current foster parent or caregiver, or caseworker, if requested. Provides that the Department shall adopt rules for maintaining and providing this information by December 31, 2021. Provides that the Advocacy Office shall include an electronic mail address in addition to a toll-free telephone number that may be used to file complaints, to obtain information about the delivery of child welfare service by the Department or its agents, and to obtain the contact information for the guardian ad litem. Provides that the telephone number and electronic mail address shall be included in all appropriate notices and handbooks regarding services available through the Department. Provides that the Department shall provide a flyer to all youth entering care describing the responsibilities of the Advocacy Office, the telephone number and electronic mailing address for the Advocacy Office, and a description of the role of a guardian ad litem. Provides that the Department shall also provide this flyer to youth at every administrative case review. Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
DCFS-GUARDIAN AD LITEM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-30 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0208 |
2021-07-30 | Senate | Effective Date July 30, 2021 |
2021-07-30 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2021-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-17 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Greg Harris |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sue Scherer |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Morrison |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 17 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |