IL SB0735 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mortgage Foreclosure Article of the Code of Civil Procedure. In provisions outlining under which circumstances the court is not required to appoint a special representative for a deceased mortgagor for the purpose of defending the action, adds situations where there is a: (i) beneficiary under a transfer on death instrument; (ii) person or entity that was conveyed title to the property by the deceased mortgagor prior to death; (iii) person or entity that was conveyed title to the property under the administration of the deceased's estate; or (iv) trust that was conveyed title to the property.
Title
FORECLOSRE-SPEC REPRESENTATIVE
Sponsors
Sen. John Mulroe [D] | Rep. Louis Lang [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-10 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0024 |
2015-07-10 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2016 |
2015-07-10 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2015-05-13 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2015-05-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-000-000 |
2015-04-20 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-14 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2015-03-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 5, 2015 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 19, 2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 15-1501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |