IL SB0719 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
REVENUE-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Revenue |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Revenue |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 120 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |