IL SB0705 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Higher Education Veterans Service Act. Provides that a required survey and guidebook shall be made available on the homepage of a campus website or a veteran Internet link (instead of just the survey being made available on the homepage of the campus Internet link). Requires the survey to be sent to the Lieutenant Governor, Secretary of State, State Treasurer, and State Comptroller. Requires each public college and university to make its best efforts to hire a veteran of the armed services as the Coordinator of Veterans and Military Personnel Student Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HIGHER ED-VETERANS SERVICE ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-05-03HouseArrived in House
2017-05-03SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-03-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2017-02-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-02-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-02-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2017
2017-02-16SenateDo Pass Veterans Affairs; 006-000-000
2017-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-02-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-02-08SenateAssigned to Veterans Affairs
2017-02-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-01-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-30SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-30SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1104915Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback