IL SB0659 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-14)
Status: Passed on July 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0134
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-14)
Status: Passed on July 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0134
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Professional Regulation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation shall create and maintain a website to help persons wishing to create new businesses or relocate businesses to Illinois. Establishes requirements for information to be included on the website.
Title
NEW BUSINESS PERMITTING PORTAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-24 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0134 |
2015-07-24 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2016 |
2015-07-24 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2015-06-12 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-14 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2015-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2015-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2015-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2015-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2015-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2015-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2015-05-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Small Business Empowerment & Workforce Development Committee; 012-000-000 |
2015-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2015-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2015-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2015-04-27 | House | Assigned to Small Business Empowerment & Workforce Development Committee |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2015-04-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-21 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-21 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2015-04-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2015 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Commerce and Economic Development; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Commerce and Economic Development |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Postponed - Commerce and Economic Development |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Gary Forby |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Postponed - Commerce and Economic Development |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |