IL SB0642 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Judicial Districts Act of 2021. Provides for the specific counties to be included in the second, third, fourth, and fifth judicial districts. Amends the Judicial Districts Act. Provides that the judicial districts listed in the Act are effective until the effective date of this amendatory Act. Repeals the Judicial Redistricting Act of 1997 (which has been held unconstitutional). Effective immediately.
Title
CLERKS OF COURTS-PAYMENTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - Motion To Adopt in House (Y: 72 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - Motion To Adopt in House (Y: 72 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0011 |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Effective Date June 4, 2021 |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 041-018-000 |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 041-018-000 |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2021-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2021-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-045-000 |
2021-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted 072-045-000 |
2021-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Redistricting Committee; 006-004-000 |
2021-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Redistricting Committee |
2021-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2021-05-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2021-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-27 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-006-000 |
2021-05-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-05-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2021-05-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris |
2021-05-26 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 071-043-000 |
2021-05-26 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Greg Harris |
2021-05-26 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2021-05-26 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-05-15 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 23, 2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 009-000-000 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 105 | 27.3b | Amended Code | Citation Text |