IL SB0630 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate Firefighter Article of the Illinois Pension Code in a Section concerning disability arising in the line of duty. Provides that a firefighter shall be considered "on duty" and engaged in an "act of duty" while on any assignment approved by the chief of the fire department, including participation in training activities designed to enhance the skills and abilities of the firefighter, whether within or away from the municipality he or she serves as a firefighter, if the assignment is related to the fire protection service of the municipality. Provides that such activity shall continue to be considered an "act of duty" even if performed without compensation. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
PENS CD-DWNST FIRE-ACT OF DUTY
Sponsors
Sen. Omar Aquino [D] | Sen. Emil Jones [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Re-assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.41 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 4-110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=630&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0630.htm |