IL SB0620 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Third Reading - Lost; 024-027-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Third Reading - Lost; 024-027-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Riverboat Gambling Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
VIDEO GAMING-TRUCK STOPS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 24 N: 27 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Lost; 024-027-000 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed May 17, 2017 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Syverson |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Link |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Assignments |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Gaming |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Gaming; 011-003-001 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Gaming |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Syverson |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Gaming; 011-002-000 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Gaming |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
230 | 10 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |