IL SB0620 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Third Reading - Lost; 024-027-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Riverboat Gambling Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VIDEO GAMING-TRUCK STOPS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 24 N: 27 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23SenateThird Reading - Lost; 024-027-000
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar - Consideration Postponed May 17, 2017
2017-05-16SenateThird Reading - Consideration Postponed
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Syverson
2017-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Link
2017-05-16SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Assignments
2017-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Gaming
2017-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Gaming; 011-003-001
2017-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
2017-05-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Gaming
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2017-05-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Syverson
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Gaming; 011-002-000
2017-03-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Gaming
2017-03-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
230101Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback