IL SB0588 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0214
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0214
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Creates a tax increment allocation financing extension for an ordinance adopted on January 31, 1995 by the Village of Milledgeville. Effective immediately.
Title
TIF-MILLEDGEVILLE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0214 |
2017-08-18 | Senate | Effective Date August 18, 2017 |
2017-08-18 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-002-000 |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-18 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-05 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2017-04-05 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 15, 2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2017 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 007-000-000 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 11-74.4-3.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |