IL SB0584 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0308
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0308
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Metro-East Sanitary District Act of 1974. Provides that, beginning on the effective date of the amendatory Act, the mayor, or his or her designee, of the largest municipality in the county having the greater equalized assessed valuation of the district shall be an ex officio commissioner of the Metro-East Sanitary District's Board of Commissioners with voting rights. Provides that, if there is not a vacant commissioner position from the county having the greater equalized assessed valuation on the effective date of the amendatory Act, then the term of the last appointed commissioner from that county is terminated on the effective date of the amendatory Act. Provides that, for the purpose of determining the ex officio commissioner, the county having the greater equalized assessed valuation of the district shall be established on January 1 of each year, and the ex officio commissioner shall serve until January 1 of the following year. Requires that the Executive Director of the district be a resident of the district and makes restrictions to the Executive Director's contract. Makes conforming changes.
Title
NON-HOME RULE MUNI RETAILERS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 37 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0308 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 037-019-000 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Verified |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Revenue; 006-003-000 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 29, 2019 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2019-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 072-044-000 |
2019-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2019-05-27 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2019-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2019-05-15 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 008-005-000 |
2019-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2019-05-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-05-14 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-001-000 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; McGuire |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 005-000-000 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 85 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |