IL SB0574 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that certain penalties regarding the operation of an uninsured motor vehicle apply to any operator of a motor vehicle subject to registration under a law of another state that is similar to the Code.
Title
VEH CD-OPERATION UNINSURED VEH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-15 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2021-05-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 010-000-000 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-707 | Amended Code | Citation Text |