IL SB0567 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0153
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0153
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Optometric Practice Act of 1987. Provides that an optometrist licensed under the Act may practice optometry through telehealth as authorized by the Act and the Telehealth Act. Provides that an optometrist treating a patient located in Illinois through telehealth must be licensed under the Act. Provides that an optometrist practicing optometry through telehealth is subject to the same standard of care and practice standards that are applicable to optometric services provided in a clinic or office setting. Provides that an optometrist may not provide telehealth services unless the optometrist has established a provider-patient relationship with the patient. Provides that an optometrist treating a patient through telehealth must perform a minimum eye examination as required by the Illinois Administrative Code before prescribing eyeglasses or contact lenses to the patient. Provides that if the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation has reason to believe that a person has violated the provisions of the Act, it may issue a rule to show cause why an order to cease and desist should not be entered against that person. Provides that the rule shall clearly set forth the grounds relied upon by the Department and shall provide a period of 7 days from the date of the rule to file an answer to the satisfaction of the Department. Provides that failure to answer to the satisfaction of the Department shall cause an order to cease and desist to be issued immediately. Defines terms.
Title
OPTOMETRIC PRACTICE-TELEHEALTH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0153 |
2021-07-23 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-07-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 111-000-001 |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2021-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2021-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Villivalam |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 007-000-000 |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 23, 2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 80 | 15.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 80 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |