IL SB0560 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Relative to the financial audits made annually by the Auditor General of the financial statements of all accounts, funds, and other moneys in the care, custody, or control of a regional superintendent of schools or educational service region, provides that the regional office of education or educational service center may utilize a cash basis, modified cash basis, or generally accepted accounting principles (GAAP) basis of accounting in the preparation of the financial statements. Makes changes to require audit reports to be published on the Auditor General's website and distributed in accordance with the Illinois State Auditing Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-FIN AUDIT-CASH BASIS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-16SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-04-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2021-04-07SenateAssigned to Education
2021-03-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2021-02-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-23SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-23SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10552-3.17aAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback