IL SB0560 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Methamphetamine Control and Community Protection Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM-OBJECT IN LIEU OF AIRBAG

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-05-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-05-14HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-14HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-05-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-10HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-10HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bennett
2018-04-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 009-000-000
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Reported Back To Criminal Law; 003-000-000
2018-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
2018-03-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2018-03-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-02-27SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-02-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 7, 2018
2018-02-06SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-04-25SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7206461Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback