IL SB0554 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that it is unlawful for a person who has been convicted of a felony to knowingly possess in any vehicle a weapon prohibited under the unlawful use of weapons statute or to knowingly possess firearm ammunition.
Title
CRIM CD-UUW-FELON-VEHICLE
Sponsors
Sen. Jil Tracy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-02-07 | Senate | To Criminal Law- Special Issues |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Re-assigned to Criminal Law |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-24 | Senate | To Criminal Law- Clear Compliance |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 24-1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=554&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0554.htm |