IL SB0542 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Library District Act of 1991. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the automatic disconnection of territory.
Title
LOCAL GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Link [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-07-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) |
2011-07-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) |
2011-07-23 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 4, 2011 |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 009-000-000 |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 009-000-000 |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 015-000-000 |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
75 | 16 | 15-85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |